Identification
Personal identification
- Full name
- Tiago Miguel Guterres Neves Sequeira
Citation names
- Sequeira, Tiago
- Neves Sequeira, Tiago
Author identifiers
- Ciência ID
- F614-52AD-70CF
- ORCID iD
- 0000-0002-5501-1562
- Scopus Author Id
- 8310778100
Email addresses
- tiago.n.sequeira@fe.uc.pt (Professional)
Websites
- https://sites.google.com/view/tiago-neves-sequeira/ (Professional)
Knowledge fields
- Social Sciences - Economics and Business - Economics
Languages
Language | Speaking | Reading | Writing | Listening | Peer-review |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
English | Advanced (C1) | Advanced (C1) | Advanced (C1) | Advanced (C1) | Advanced (C1) |
Education
Degree | Classification | |
---|---|---|
2010/09/14
Concluded
|
Economics (Macroeconomics) (Título de Agregado)
Universidade Nova de Lisboa Nova School of Business and Economics, Portugal
|
Unanimidade/unanimously |
2004
Concluded
|
Economia (Doutoramento)
Major in Especialidade: Macroeconomia
Universidade Nova de Lisboa Nova School of Business and Economics, Portugal
"Essays on Human Capital, Economic Growth and Development" (THESIS/DISSERTATION)
|
|
1994 - 1999
Concluded
|
Economia (Licenciatura)
Universidade da Beira Interior, Portugal
|
18/20 |
Affiliation
Science
Category Host institution |
Employer | |
---|---|---|
2019/07/31 - Current | Researcher (Research) | Universidade de Coimbra, Portugal |
Universidade de Coimbra Centro de Investigação em Economia e Gestão, Portugal | ||
2013 - 2019 | Principal Investigator (Research) | Universidade de Évora Centro de Estudos e Formação Avançada em Gestão e Economia, Portugal |
2008 - 2013 | Principal Investigator (Research) | Universidade Nova de Lisboa Nova School of Business and Economics Unidade de Investigação, Portugal |
2004/09/01 - 2008/09/01 | Auxiliary Researcher (Research) | Universidade Nova de Lisboa Nova School of Business and Economics Unidade de Investigação, Portugal |
Teaching in Higher Education
Category Host institution |
Employer | |
---|---|---|
2020/03 - Current | Full Professor (University Teacher) | Universidade de Coimbra, Portugal |
Universidade de Coimbra Faculdade de Economia, Portugal | ||
2019/09/01 - 2020/03/24 | Associate Professor (University Teacher) | Universidade de Coimbra Faculdade de Economia, Portugal |
Universidade de Coimbra Faculdade de Economia, Portugal | ||
2013 - 2018 | Associate Professor (University Teacher) | Universidade da Beira Interior, Portugal |
2004 - 2013 | Assistant Professor (University Teacher) | Universidade da Beira Interior, Portugal |
2002 - 2004 | Lecturer (University Teacher) | Universidade da Beira Interior, Portugal |
2000 - 2002 | Lecturer (University Teacher) | Universidade Nova de Lisboa Nova School of Business and Economics, Portugal |
Positions / Appointments
Category Host institution |
Employer | |
---|---|---|
2020 - Current | Co-Chair of the Economics Group | Universidade de Coimbra Faculdade de Economia, Portugal |
Universidade de Coimbra Faculdade de Economia, Portugal | ||
2020 - Current | Co-Chair of the PhD Economics Program | Universidade de Coimbra Faculdade de Economia, Portugal |
Universidade de Coimbra, Portugal | ||
2020 - Current | Co-Editor in Chief of Notas Económicas | Universidade de Coimbra Faculdade de Economia, Portugal |
Centro Interuniversitário de História das Ciências e da Tecnologia, Portugal (...) |
||
2015 - 2017 | Coordenação ou direção de centro de investigação, departamento ou equivalente | Universidade da Beira Interior, Portugal |
2013 - 2017 | Conselho científico/técnico-científico ou orgão correspondente | Universidade da Beira Interior, Portugal |
2013 - 2015 | Diretor ou presidente da unidade orgânica | Universidade da Beira Interior, Portugal |
2009/06/01 - 2013/06/01 | Pro-Rector | Universidade da Beira Interior, Portugal |
2004/11/01 - 2006/11/01 | Organic Unit Director | Universidade da Beira Interior Departamento de Gestão e Economia, Portugal |
Projects
Grant
Designation | Funders | |
---|---|---|
2011/04 - 2014/10 | Education Mismatches and Productivity Differences | Fundação para a Ciência e a Tecnologia, I.P. |
2010/04 - 2013/09 | Externalities, Equilibriums and Policy Lessons from Multi-Sector Models of Endogenous Growth | Fundação para a Ciência e a Tecnologia, I.P. |
2007/01 - 2009/12 | Education and Economic Growth | Fundação para a Ciência e a Tecnologia, I.P. |
2005/06 - 2007/12 | Education and Economic Growth | Fundação para a Ciência e a Tecnologia, I.P. |
Contract
Designation | Funders | |
---|---|---|
2021/06/06 - 2022/03/31 | Estudo de análise custo -benefício sobre a Zona Franca da Madeira
0000000
Principal investigator
Universidade de Coimbra Centro de Investigação em Economia e Gestão, Portugal
|
Concluded
|
2019 - 2021 | Um novo paradigma para a economia portuguesa: do “made in” para o “created in” Portugal
0000000
Co-Principal Investigator (Co-PI)
Fundação Francisco Manuel dos Santos, Portugal
|
Concluded
|
2019/01/01 - 2019/12/31 | Center for Advanced Studies in Management and Economics
UID/ECO/04007/2019
Universidade do Algarve, Portugal
Universidade da Beira Interior, Portugal Universidade de Évora, Portugal Centro de Estudos e Formação Avançada em Gestão e Economia, Portugal Universidade Nova de Lisboa Associação para a Inovação e Desenvolvimento da FCT, Portugal |
Fundação para a Ciência e a Tecnologia
Concluded
|
2011/01/01 - 2012/12/31 | Projecto Estratégico - UI 124 - 2011-2012
PEst-OE/EGE/UI0124/2011
Universidade NOVA de Lisboa NOVA School of Business and Economics, Portugal
|
Fundação para a Ciência e a Tecnologia
Concluded
|
Outputs
Publications
Book |
|
Book chapter |
|
Journal article |
|
Other
Other output |
|
Activities
Supervision
Thesis Title Role |
Degree Subject (Type) Institution / Organization |
|
---|---|---|
2018 - 2018 | Growth Accounting and Regressions: a new methodological approach to capital and technology
Supervisor
|
Economia (Master)
Universidade da Beira Interior, Portugal
|
2015 - 2015 | On the Relationship between Religiosity, Human Capital and Income
Supervisor
|
Economia (Master)
Universidade da Beira Interior, Portugal
|
2014 - 2014 | On the Relationship between Religiosity and Technological Progress
Supervisor
|
Economia (Master)
Universidade da Beira Interior, Portugal
|
2013 - 2013 | Essays in Economic Development, Human Capital, Technology and Inequality
Supervisor
|
Economia (PhD)
Universidade da Beira Interior, Portugal
|
2012 - 2012 | Essays on public debt, growth and development in Africa
Co-supervisor
|
Economia (PhD)
Universidade da Beira Interior, Portugal
|
Consulting
Activity description | Institution / Organization | |
---|---|---|
2021 - 2021 | Invited by the President of the Republic, Marcelo Rebelo de Sousa, to be heard about to the EU Next Generation Framework and the portuguese economy | Presidência da República Portuguesa, Portugal |
2020/04 - 2020/04 | Invited by the Prime-Minister of Portugal to be heard about the pos-COVID-19 crisis period | Governo da República Portuguesa, Portugal |
2013 - 2013 | Invited by the President of the Portuguese Republic for consulting on the post-crises period | Presidência da República Portuguesa, Portugal |
Course / Discipline taught
Academic session | Degree Subject (Type) | Institution / Organization | |
---|---|---|---|
2004 - Current | Microeconomics, Principles of Microeconomics, Principles of Macroeconomics, Macroeconomics, Intermediate Macroeconomics, Advanced Macroeconomics, Applied Econometrics, Statistics, Economic Growth | Universidade da Beira Interior, Portugal Universidade Nova de Lisboa Nova School of Business and Economics, Portugal Universidade de Évora, Portugal Universidade de Coimbra Faculdade de Economia, Portugal |
Evaluation committee
Activity description Role |
Institution / Organization | Funding entity | |
---|---|---|---|
2016 - Current | Evaluator of Research Projects
Evaluator
|
National Science Centre, Poland | |
2014 - Current | Member of Selection Committees for teachers
Member
|
Instituto Politécnico de Lisboa Instituto Superior de Contabilidade e Administração de Lisboa, Portugal | |
2008 - Current | Member of Committees for the evaluation of scientific projects
Evaluator
|
Fundação para a Ciência e a Tecnologia, Portugal | |
2004 - Current | Member of Evaluation Committees of Master and PhD Dissertations
Evaluator
|
Universidade da Beira Interior, Portugal Universidade do Porto Faculdade de Economia, Portugal Universidade de Coimbra Faculdade de Economia, Portugal |
|
2018 - 2018 | Evaluation of the best master thesis in Economics - Banco de Portugal
Evaluator
|
Banco de Portugal, Portugal | |
2004 - 2018 | Member of Selection Committees for teachers
Member
|
Universidade da Beira Interior, Portugal |
Distinctions
Award
2011 | Best Researcher in Social Sciences and Humanities in the University |
2004 | Bolsa Amélia de Melo
Universidade Nova de Lisboa Nova School of Business and Economics, Portugal
|
Other distinction
2019 | Ranking of Portuguese Economists (CEF.UP+NIPE) |
2019 | Ranking of Portuguese Economists (CEF.UP+NIPE) - Economic Development, Technological Change and Growth |
2019 | Ranking Ideas |